U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wynne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.