U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whittecar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [17(b) Exparte Motion for USMS to serve witness subpoena]
  • January 03, 2023: [Petition for Remission]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.