U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lodge Pole
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Travel ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.