U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laverdure et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 22, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.