U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 03, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.