U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • January 17, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.