U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bad Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.