U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 24, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • November 10, 2022: [Revoke]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.