U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:09-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sheehan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.