U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Campa v. Yellowstone County Detention Facility Nurse Staff
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.