U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Plainbull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Revocation of Pretrial Release Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Quash ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [In Limine ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.