U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Letz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.