U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • September 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • September 06, 2022: [Revoke]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.