U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brien
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.