U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richardson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.