U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Washee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.