U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schilling
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 19, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Information - Felony - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.