U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PEREZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 30, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.