U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Dismiss ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appear]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Vacate]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.