U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Petersen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.