U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.