U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:09-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vervick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.