U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Szlasa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 25, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.