U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adcock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.