U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 25, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.