U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.