U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.