U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-po-05066-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Carlton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Add Disposition Text]
  • October 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Minutes - Initial Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • August 31, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.