U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Magleby Construction Sun Valley v. SP Hotel Owner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 13, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.