U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:88-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 02, 2022: [Remark - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.