U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00145
  • Case Name: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Huelskamp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 09, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 20, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.