U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bullshoe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 11, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Arrest ]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.