U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lakey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.