U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Hefty v. Western Montana Mental Health Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.