U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Potts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.