U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Seizure or Inspection Warrant - Application Denied]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.