U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Slagel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 09, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 09, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.