U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Travel ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.