U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wylie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 19, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 29, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 15, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.