U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cantrell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 22, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.