U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blackman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2023: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.