U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Terry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.