U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Camp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.