U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stillsmoking
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Issued (Sealed) - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.