U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodarte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.