U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lund et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.