U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tavares
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 26, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 25, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
September, 2022
  • September 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Information - Felony (Sealed) - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.