U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-mj-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moll
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons]
  • September 12, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.