U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Whitworth v. Don Bell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.