U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-po-05074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gittins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Add Disposition Text]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Vacate]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order - MTD]
  • September 15, 2022: [Minutes - Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.